This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/04/2023 at 07:20:57 (UTC).

SANDBERG, ERIC vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 SANDBERG, ERIC filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1842

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDBERG, ERIC

SANDBERG, KERRY

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING CHIEF APPRAISER ROLAND

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAZIER, CLEMETRIC

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

01/11/2023: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/11/2023: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation Return

02/01/2023: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT BY SERVING CHIEF APPRAISER ROLAND; Issued: 1/11/2023; Served: 1/23/2023; Tracking: 74097856; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, CLEMETRIC; Person Filing: SANDBERG, KERRY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, CLEMETRIC; Person Filing: SANDBERG, ERIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less