This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/06/2020 at 07:37:05 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, ROSELBYS GONZALEZ vs. BUCKLEY, JESSE (JR)

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 SANCHEZ, ROSELBYS GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BUCKLEY, JESSE JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN KIRKLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1449

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

STEVEN KIRKLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, ROSELBYS GONZALEZ

Defendants

BUCKLEY, JESSE (JR)

Dallas, TX 75232

JAKE'S INC (D/B/A) JAKE'S FINER FODDS INC

Other

JAKE'S INC (D/B/A) JAKE'S FINER FODDS INC (TEXAS FOR-PROFIT

13400 Hollister Dr

Houston, TX 77086

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVILA, JESUS GERARDO

 

Court Documents

Return (Jesse Buckley Jr):

07/21/2020: Return (Jesse Buckley Jr):

Civil Process Request

07/13/2020: Civil Process Request

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

07/13/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

Return: of Jake's Inc. dba Jake's Finer Foods:

07/17/2020: Return: of Jake's Inc. dba Jake's Finer Foods:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BUCKLEY, JESSE (JR); Issued: 7/15/2020; Served: 7/16/2020; Tracking: 73767782; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JAKE'S INC (D/B/A) JAKE'S FINER FODDS INC (TEXAS FOR-PROFIT; Issued: 7/15/2020; Served: 7/16/2020; Tracking: 73767774; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JAKE'S INC (D/B/A) JAKE'S FINER FODDS INC (TEXAS FOR-PROFIT; Issued: 7/15/2020; Served: 7/16/2020; Tracking: 73767774; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DAVILA, JESUS GERARDO; Person Filing: SANCHEZ, ROSELBYS GONZALEZ;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jake Dog LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVILA, JESUS GERARDO