This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:31:09 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, RENEE LYNN vs. SANCHEZ, CHRISTOPHER LEE

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 SANCHEZ, RENEE LYNN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANCHEZ, CHRISTOPHER LEE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6357

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, RENEE LYNN

Defendant

SANCHEZ, CHRISTOPHER LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING ASSIGNMENT OF WAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • ORDER SGND GRNTG QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • FOCAS PROJECT - IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • MOTION TO REINSTATE GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • REINSTATEMENT ON COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - THOMPSON, JACK W. Person Filing - SANCHEZ, RENEE LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less