Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:46:02 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, LEONEL vs. GARZA, RUPERTO

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 SANCHEZ, LEONEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARZA, RUPERTO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9537

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ, LEONEL

Defendant

GARZA, RUPERTO

Houston, TX 77022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARKRIDER, DEREK M.

Defendant Attorney

FUENTES, ALEJANDRO JR.

 

Court Documents

Citation

05/19/2020: Citation

Amended Notice of Submission

06/03/2020: Amended Notice of Submission

Notice of Submission

06/03/2020: Notice of Submission

Proposed Final Judgement

06/03/2020: Proposed Final Judgement

Plainitff's Service Members' Affidavit

06/03/2020: Plainitff's Service Members' Affidavit

Exhibits

06/03/2020: Exhibits

Exhibits

06/03/2020: Exhibits

Exhibits

06/03/2020: Exhibits

Certificate Of Last Address

06/03/2020: Certificate Of Last Address

Billing Records Affidavits

06/03/2020: Billing Records Affidavits

Affidavit Of Leonel Sanchez

06/03/2020: Affidavit Of Leonel Sanchez

Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment

06/03/2020: Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment

DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

06/09/2020: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Plaintiffs Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service-Garza

03/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service-Garza

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239); Results: Passed; Comments: PER ERICA 06/10/2020; Requesting Party: HARKRIDER, DEREK M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FUENTES, ALEJANDRO JR.; Person Filing: GARZA, RUPERTO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GARZA, RUPERTO; Issued: 4/1/2020; Served: 4/23/2020; Received: 5/19/2020; Tracking: 73739639; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HARKRIDER, DEREK M.; Person Filing: SANCHEZ, LEONEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARKRIDER, DEREK MICHAEL