This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/29/2022 at 07:31:34 (UTC).

SALINAS, JOSE vs. CARRANZA, CARLOS E

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 SALINAS, JOSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARRANZA, CARLOS E. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7090

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALINAS, JOSE

Defendants

CARRANZA, CARLOS E

Houston, TX 77034

MOLINA, ROSA N

Houston, TX 77034

RE/MAX LLC (D/B/A RE/MAX UNIVERSAL)

MORTON, SHARON J

Cypress, TX 77429

YOUNG, DARIN

Cypress, TX 77429

RE/MAX UNIVERSAL

Other

RE/MAX LLC (D/B/A RE/MAX UNIVERSAL) MAY BE SERVED VIA ITS REGISTERED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBOA, BRITTANEY MARIE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

05/05/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Cover Letter

05/05/2022: Cover Letter

CITATION: CARLOS E CARRANZA:

05/24/2022: CITATION: CARLOS E CARRANZA:

CITATION: MOLINA, ROSA N:

05/24/2022: CITATION: MOLINA, ROSA N:

CITATION: SHARON J. MORTON:

05/24/2022: CITATION: SHARON J. MORTON:

CITATION: DARIN YOUNG:

05/24/2022: CITATION: DARIN YOUNG:

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: REMAX LLC DBA REMAX UNIVERSAL:

05/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: REMAX LLC DBA REMAX UNIVERSAL:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RE/MAX LLC (D/B/A RE/MAX UNIVERSAL) MAY BE SERVED VIA ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/17/2022; Tracking: 74003015; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: YOUNG, DARIN; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/23/2022; Tracking: 74003046; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MORTON, SHARON J; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/21/2022; Tracking: 74003045; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MOLINA, ROSA N; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/16/2022; Tracking: 74003043; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CARRANZA, CARLOS E; Issued: 5/6/2022; Served: 5/14/2022; Tracking: 74003042; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GAMBOA, BRITTANEY MARIE; Person Filing: SALINAS, JOSE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RE/MAX, LLC is a litigant