This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 07:43:30 (UTC).

SALAS, KENIA vs. MENDOZA, ERICK

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 SALAS, KENIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MENDOZA, ERICK. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2363

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALAS, KENIA

Defendants

MENDOZA, ERICK

Houston, TX 77060

RAISER LLC

Other

RAISER LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/15/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

07/15/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/15/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Return Of Service - Raiser, LLC

08/02/2022: Return Of Service - Raiser, LLC

Return of Service Erik Mendoza

08/01/2022: Return of Service Erik Mendoza

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MENDOZA, ERICK; Issued: 7/15/2022; Served: 7/30/2022; Tracking: 74027368; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RAISER LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 7/15/2022; Served: 8/1/2022; Tracking: 74027366; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN; Person Filing: SALAS, KENIA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAPAPAVLOU, JOHN