This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:13:08 (UTC).

SABINE PIPE LINE LLC vs. CHALKLEY TRANSMISSION COMPANY LTD

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 SABINE PIPE LINE LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHALKLEY TRANSMISSION COMPANY LTD. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0552

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABINE PIPE LINE LLC

Defendant

CHALKLEY TRANSMISSION COMPANY LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COVELER, MATTHEW E.

Defendant Attorney

COPLEN, BRUCE A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2006
  • DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2006
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • ORD SGN GRNTNG PROTECTION FROM DISCOVERY REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COPLEN, BRUCE A. Person Filing - CHALKLEY TRANSMISSION COMPANY LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COPLEN, BRUCE A. Person Filing - CHALKLEY TRANSMISSION COMPANY LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COVELER, MATTHEW E. Person Filing - SABINE PIPE LINE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less