This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:05:32 (UTC).

RYAN, JAMES EDWIN vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 RYAN, JAMES EDWIN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******536A

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN, JAMES EDWIN

Defendants

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION) (CORPORATION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA D B RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

DANA CORPORATION

GUARDLINE INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO TWENTIETH CENTURY

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY (AKA 3M)

3M (AKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

PFIZER INC (CORPORATION)

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

RAPID AMERICAN CORPORATION (FKA GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION) (IND AND AS

GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION

T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTIC COMPANY INC

UNIROYAL HOLDING INC (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO U S RUBBER

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, J. MARK

Defendant Attorney

RAMIREZ, MICHAEL JOHN

Other Attorneys

GIBSON, RICK

FRASE, LAURA ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW OUT OF STATE LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • ORDER SIGNED DESIGNATING CASE TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2008
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - RYAN, JAMES EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less