Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/10/2015 at 03:53:57 (UTC).

RUSSELL, RAYMOND R JR vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/10/2005 RUSSELL, RAYMOND R JR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7428

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL, RAYMOND R JR

Defendants

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (DBA UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION CHEMICALS

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO)

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING CO

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

A M F INCORPORATED

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION

BECHTEL GROUP INC

W S BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (FKA BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CO

BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CO TEXAS

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CO (FKA HERCULES INC)

HERCULES INC

CRANE COMPANY

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

Defendant Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

TAYLOR, DAVID M.

POWERS, JAMES H.

CALDERON, RAUL M.

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID

ADAMS, KENT M.

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

Other Attorneys

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

SMITH, J. MICHAEL

WADE, TODD N.

WILSON, JACKSON D. II

FUNDERBURK, LARRY B.

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

RICE, B. STEVE

WHITE, CLAY M.

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

3 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - W S BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (FKA BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLLEY, CHRISTOPHER CHAMBLIS Person Filing - RUSSELL, RAYMOND R JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DAVIS, DENNIS D. Person Filing - SHELL CHEMICAL LP (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA SHELL CHEMICAL CO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MICHAEL Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY (TEXAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - TRINITY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC (TEXAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - FBCO INC (F/K/A NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - PAPPAS, GEORGE P. Person Filing - FBCO INC (F/K/A NATKIN SERVICE CO OF KANSAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, KENT M. Person Filing - W S BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (FKA BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID Person Filing - BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID Person Filing - BECHTEL GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - RUSSELL, RAYMOND R JR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BECHTEL POWER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HERCULES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BECHTEL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMF INC is a litigant