This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/26/2022 at 09:58:31 (UTC).

RUIZ, EZEQUIEL GONZALEZ vs. FRANCO, SARA NACOLE

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 RUIZ, EZEQUIEL GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANCO, SARA NACOLE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5607

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUIZ, EZEQUIEL GONZALEZ

GONZALEZ-SORIANO, ROXANA

Defendant

FRANCO, SARA NACOLE

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BILL, RYAN

Defendant Attorney

CAVANAGH, JONATHAN DOWNES

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/29/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

07/29/2022: Request for Issuance of Service

Citation

08/24/2022: Citation

Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

09/13/2022: Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant's Jury Demand

09/13/2022: Defendant's Jury Demand

Defendant's Objection to Plaintiffs' Notice of Rule 193.7 Filing

09/13/2022: Defendant's Objection to Plaintiffs' Notice of Rule 193.7 Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CAVANAGH, JONATHAN DOWNES; Person Filing: FRANCO, SARA NACOLE;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FRANCO, SARA NACOLE; Issued: 8/2/2022; Served: 8/22/2022; Tracking: 74033070; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BILL, RYAN; Person Filing: GONZALEZ-SORIANO, ROXANA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BILL, RYAN; Person Filing: RUIZ, EZEQUIEL GONZALEZ;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less