This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/26/2016 at 01:36:16 (UTC).

RSD SUPPLY INC vs. VALLOUREC USA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 RSD SUPPLY INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALLOUREC USA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8419

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RSD SUPPLY INC

Defendants

VALLOUREC & MANNESMAN TUBES

VAM USA LLC

VALLOUREC USA CORPORATION

VALLOUREC TUBE-ALLOY LLC

VALLOUREC INDUSTRIES INC

VALLOUREC & MANNESMAN GMBH (DBA VALLOUREC & MANNESMAN TUBES)

VALLOUREC DRILLING PRODUCTS USA INC

Others

VAM USA LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX

VALLOUREC DRILLING PRODUCTS USA INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

VALLOUREC USA CORPORATION (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

VALLOUREC TUBE-ALLOY LLC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

VALLOUREC INDUSTRIES INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

VALLOUREC & MANNESMAN GMBH (D/B/A VALLOUREC & MANNESMAN TUBES)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARPE, MATTHEW DARRELL

Defendant Attorney

BURBACH, JEFF D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request Form

03/22/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Process Request Form

03/22/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Process Request Form

03/22/2016: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Information Sheet

03/22/2016: Civil Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosures

03/22/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosures

Letter regarding payment for filing

03/28/2016: Letter regarding payment for filing

Citation Corporate- Vallourec USA Corporation

04/22/2016: Citation Corporate- Vallourec USA Corporation

Citation- Vallourec & Mannesman GMBH

04/22/2016: Citation- Vallourec & Mannesman GMBH

Citation Corporate- Vallourec Tube- Alloy LLC

04/22/2016: Citation Corporate- Vallourec Tube- Alloy LLC

Citation Corporate- Vallourec Industries Inc

04/22/2016: Citation Corporate- Vallourec Industries Inc

Citation Corporate- Vallourec Drilling Products USA Inc

04/22/2016: Citation Corporate- Vallourec Drilling Products USA Inc

Citation Corporate- VAM USA LLC

04/22/2016: Citation Corporate- VAM USA LLC

Defendant Vallourec Tube -Alloy, LLC.'s Original Answer and Verified Denial

05/16/2016: Defendant Vallourec Tube -Alloy, LLC.'s Original Answer and Verified Denial

Defendant Vallourec Industries, Inc.'s Original Answer and Verified Denial

05/16/2016: Defendant Vallourec Industries, Inc.'s Original Answer and Verified Denial

Defendant Vam USA, LLC's Original Answer and Verified Denial

05/16/2016: Defendant Vam USA, LLC's Original Answer and Verified Denial

Defendant Vallourec Drilling Products USA, Inc.s Original Answer and Verified Denial

05/16/2016: Defendant Vallourec Drilling Products USA, Inc.s Original Answer and Verified Denial

Defendant Vallourec USA Corporation's Original Answer and Verified Denial

05/16/2016: Defendant Vallourec USA Corporation's Original Answer and Verified Denial

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

06/19/2016: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2016
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/19/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURBACH, JEFF D.; Person Filing: VALLOUREC TUBE-ALLOY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURBACH, JEFF D.; Person Filing: VALLOUREC USA CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURBACH, JEFF D.; Person Filing: VAM USA LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURBACH, JEFF D.; Person Filing: VALLOUREC DRILLING PRODUCTS USA INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURBACH, JEFF D.; Person Filing: VALLOUREC INDUSTRIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHARPE, MATTHEW DARRELL; Person Filing: RSD SUPPLY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less