Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/19/2015 at 20:58:21 (UTC).

ROSS, WILLIE L vs. A O SMITH CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/28/2005 ROSS, WILLIE L filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A O SMITH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9110

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ROSS, WILLIE L

D & F DISTRIBUTING INC

GREENE TWEED & CO

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

OKONITE COMPANY (THE)

ANCO INSULATIONS INC

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (FORMERLY KNOWN AS ALLIED SIGNAL INC)

A O SMITH CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON CO

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC (FKA RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS)

RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC (FNA AMERICAN BILTRITE RUBBER COMPANY INC)

AMERICAN BILTRITE RUBBER COMPANY INC

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

ANCO INSULATION INC

76 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR.

BLAKENEY, MICHAEL LADON

RHODES, KENNETH D.

RAMSEY, RUSSELL J.

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

MOYE, DONNA POLIDORO

CARLSON, ERIC

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

POWELL, LISA A.

POWERS, JAMES H.

MASTON, KAREN KAY

Other Attorneys

WHITE, CLAY M.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

ARREDONDO, ROBERT DAVID

KAMRANI, NATASHA M.

RAMIREZ, MICHAEL JOHN

BREM, MICHAEL LAMAR

VANCLEAVE, MARK DEAN

ADAMS, KENT M.

RILEY, JAMES M. JR.

17 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MARSAW, GLENYCE SHANAI Person Filing - ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC (PREVIOUSLY KNOWN AS 20TH CENTURY GLOVE CORP OF TEXAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • ANSWER THIRD PARTY PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - CRANE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR. Person Filing - ROSS, WILLIE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC (FKA RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS) is a litigant

Latest cases where D&F DISTRIBUTING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant