This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 07:42:34 (UTC).

ROSEN, ALAN (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF DANIEL A vs. JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 ROSEN, ALAN INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF DANIEL A filed an Other lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8225

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSEN, ALAN (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF DANIEL A

ROSEN, JUDY(INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF DANIEL A

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION

CVS PHARMACY INC (FKA CVS INC FKA CVS DISTRIBUTION INC)

HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC (FKA WEST WARD PHARMACEUTICALS

HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE INC (AKA ROCHE)

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

MCKESSON CORPORATION

PFIZER INC

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC

WALGREEN CO (FKA C R WALGREEN AND COMPANY)

CVS INC

CVS DISTRIBUTION INC

WEST WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORPORATION

ROCHE

C R WALGREEN AND COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHESTER, SUSANNAH BALENTINE

Defendant Attorneys

ELLIS, JOHN WILLIAM

SCULLY, JOHN A.

EASH, KATRINA G.

SMYSER, CRAIG

BURBACH, EDWARD D.

SCOTT, ROBERT PHILIP

GRIFFIS, JOHN PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Rule 11 Agreement

08/09/2021: Rule 11 Agreement

Notice of Appearance

08/09/2021: Notice of Appearance

Proposed Order

08/16/2021: Proposed Order

Affidavit in Support of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc,'s Special Appearance to Challenge Jurisdiction

08/18/2021: Affidavit in Support of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc,'s Special Appearance to Challenge Jurisdiction

Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Special Appearance

08/16/2021: Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.'s Special Appearance

Proposed Order to Teva's Special Exceptions

08/18/2021: Proposed Order to Teva's Special Exceptions

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Special Exceptions

08/18/2021: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Special Exceptions

Exhibit A

08/20/2021: Exhibit A

Notice Of Filing of Notice of Removal

08/20/2021: Notice Of Filing of Notice of Removal

Special Appearance of HOFFMANN- LA Roche Inc.

08/23/2021: Special Appearance of HOFFMANN- LA Roche Inc.

APPENDIX E

08/05/2021: APPENDIX E

APPENDIX D

08/05/2021: APPENDIX D

APPENDIX C

08/05/2021: APPENDIX C

APPENDIX B

08/05/2021: APPENDIX B

APPENDIX A

08/05/2021: APPENDIX A

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF TAG-ALONG CASE PURSUANT TO RULE 13 TEXAS RILES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

08/05/2021: NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF TAG-ALONG CASE PURSUANT TO RULE 13 TEXAS RILES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

McKesson Corporation's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition

08/06/2021: McKesson Corporation's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition

Exhibit A

08/06/2021: Exhibit A

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCOTT, ROBERT PHILIP; Person Filing: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, JOHN WILLIAM; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCULLY, JOHN A.; Person Filing: CVS PHARMACY INC (FKA CVS INC FKA CVS DISTRIBUTION INC);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCULLY, JOHN A.; Person Filing: CVS HEALTH CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, JOHN WILLIAM; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTREST TO;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMYSER, CRAIG; Person Filing: MCKESSON CORPORATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURBACH, EDWARD D.; Person Filing: PFIZER INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, JOHN WILLIAM; Person Filing: ROSEN, ALAN (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF DANIEL A;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOFFMAN LA ROCHE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant