This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 07:25:36 (UTC).

ROSALES, JULIUS vs. HALLIBURTON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 ROSALES, JULIUS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HALLIBURTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2047

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALES, JULIUS

Defendants

HALLIBURTON COMPANY

HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC

BPX OPERATING COMPANY

Others

HALLIBURTON COMPANY (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION)

206 E 9Th Stret Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

BPX OPERATING COMPANY (A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE

206 E 9Th Stret Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGUIRRE, ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

Citation Corporate

08/31/2021: Citation Corporate

Affidavit of Service

08/31/2021: Affidavit of Service

Citation Corporate

08/31/2021: Citation Corporate

Affidavit of Service

08/31/2021: Affidavit of Service

Citation Corporate

08/31/2021: Citation Corporate

amended return of service

09/01/2021: amended return of service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

08/20/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BPX OPERATING COMPANY (A DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 8/24/2021; Served: 8/31/2021; Received: 9/1/2021; Tracking: 73905455; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION); Issued: 8/24/2021; Served: 8/30/2021; Received: 8/31/2021; Tracking: 73905454; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HALLIBURTON COMPANY (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 8/24/2021; Served: 8/30/2021; Received: 8/31/2021; Tracking: 73905453; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AGUIRRE, ALEJANDRO; Person Filing: ROSALES, JULIUS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BPX Operating Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant