This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:24:26 (UTC).

ROGERS, MARJORIE S vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 ROGERS, MARJORIE S filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5458

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

ROGERS, MARJORIE S

ROGERS, JIMMY S

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

WARREN PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON CO

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION) (CORPORATION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC (CORPORATION)

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC (SUCCESSOR TO MUNDET CORK COMPANY)

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY BY SERVING THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WATHEN, FRANK J. II

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

WARE, JAMES L.

WHITE, CLAY M.

POWERS, JAMES H.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

MACDONALD, DAVID M.

Other Attorneys

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

KNOCKAERT, ERIK ANDREW

FRASE, LAURA ANN

JUDIN, JENNIFER

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

MOIR, PETER A.

11 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - WILKINSON, ROBERT W Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2004
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION L L C (SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST BY MERGER TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWELL, LISA A. Person Filing - ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - ROGERS, JIMMY S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - ROGERS, MARJORIE S

    Read MoreRead Less