This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 01:34:22 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, SYLVIA vs. 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 RODRIGUEZ, SYLVIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL LANDRUM and C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7348

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL LANDRUM

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, SYLVIA

Defendants

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC

Others

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC (A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN RYAN

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

10/23/2020: Affidavit of Service

Defendant's Original Answer Demand for Jury Trial and Request For Disclosure

10/28/2020: Defendant's Original Answer Demand for Jury Trial and Request For Disclosure

Defendants, 99 Cents Only Stores, Texas, Inc.'s Designation Of Expert Witnesses

02/24/2021: Defendants, 99 Cents Only Stores, Texas, Inc.'s Designation Of Expert Witnesses

Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Eric Davis, MD To The Affidavit Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services of Servies of DFW MRI

02/24/2021: Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Eric Davis, MD To The Affidavit Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services of Servies of DFW MRI

Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Gireesh G. Sharda, MD To The Affidavit Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services of Epic Pain & Orthopedics

02/24/2021: Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Gireesh G. Sharda, MD To The Affidavit Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services of Epic Pain & Orthopedics

Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Ricky Edwin Merritt, R.Ph To The Affidavit Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services of Mira Vista Pharmacy

02/24/2021: Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Ricky Edwin Merritt, R.Ph To The Affidavit Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services of Mira Vista Pharmacy

Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Christopher Plate, DC To The Affidaivt Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services on Injury Relief Chiropractic

02/24/2021: Defendant's Counter-Affidavit of Christopher Plate, DC To The Affidaivt Concerning Cost And Necessity of Services on Injury Relief Chiropractic

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/20/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

10/20/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC

10/20/2020: PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC

PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

10/20/2020: PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

10/20/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Affidavit of Service

10/23/2020: Affidavit of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GRIFFIN, MICHAEL JOHN III; Person Filing: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES TEXAS INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 10/21/2020; Served: 10/23/2020; Tracking: 73803478; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC (A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 10/21/2020; Served: 10/23/2020; Tracking: 73803477; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN RYAN; Person Filing: RODRIGUEZ, SYLVIA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 99 Cents Only Stores Texas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLINGSWORTH, STEVEN R.