This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/21/2018 at 14:01:30 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, ELOY vs. STRAIGHT LINE INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC (F

Case Summary

On 01/11/2016 RODRIGUEZ, ELOY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against STRAIGHT LINE INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC F. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are DEBRA IBARRA MAYFIELD and URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1411

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

DEBRA IBARRA MAYFIELD

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, ELOY

Pasadena, TX 77503

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ADAME, LUIS

South Houston, TX 77587

STRAIGHT LINE INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC (F/K/A STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION

ADAME, JESUS

South Houston, TX 77587

STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION INC

STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION I LP

ADAME, JUAN

South Houston, TX 77587

Other

STRAIGHT LINE INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC (FKA STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUERRA JR., ADOLPH R.

GUERRA, ADOLPH R. JR.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.

 

Court Documents

certified mail return

01/21/2016: certified mail return

DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER COUNTERCLAIM AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

02/08/2016: DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER COUNTERCLAIM AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

Certificate of Written Discovery

03/29/2016: Certificate of Written Discovery

Exhibit 6

04/28/2016: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 4

04/28/2016: Exhibit 4

Exhibit 3

04/28/2016: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 19

04/28/2016: Exhibit 19

Exhibit 14

04/28/2016: Exhibit 14

Exhibit 12

04/28/2016: Exhibit 12

Affidavit of Jesus Adame

04/28/2016: Affidavit of Jesus Adame

Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

04/28/2016: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

Proposed Order

05/19/2016: Proposed Order

exhibit 1

05/19/2016: exhibit 1

plaintiffs motion for leave to file late response to defendants motion for partial summary judgment or to reset hearing

05/19/2016: plaintiffs motion for leave to file late response to defendants motion for partial summary judgment or to reset hearing

Certificate of Written Discovery

07/28/2016: Certificate of Written Discovery

Defendants Motion To Overrule Objections, To Compel Responses To Interrogatories Production Request And Admission, And For Reimbursement Of Attorneys Fees

07/28/2016: Defendants Motion To Overrule Objections, To Compel Responses To Interrogatories Production Request And Admission, And For Reimbursement Of Attorneys Fees

Plaintiff's Motion to Quash His Deposition

08/01/2016: Plaintiff's Motion to Quash His Deposition

Notice of Hearing

08/03/2016: Notice of Hearing

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2017
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Description: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 2/22/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 6/9/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Description: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE PLEADING SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/9/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: ADAME, LUIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: ADAME, JESUS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: STRAIGHT LINE INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC (F/K/A STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: ADAME, LUIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: ADAME, JUAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: ADAME, JESUS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: ADAME, JUAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Description: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: MCCORMICK, ANDREW P.; Person Filing: STRAIGHT LINE INDUSTRIAL SERVICES INC (F/K/A STRAIGHT LINE INSULATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GUERRA, ADOLPH R. JR.; Person Filing: RODRIGUEZ, ELOY;

    Read MoreRead Less