Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:42:11 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, BABE vs. LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 RODRIGUEZ, BABE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DARYL L. MOORE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9503

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DARYL L. MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ, BABE

Defendants

SADLER, WILLIAM M

Spring, TX 78611

LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.

Other

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ITKIN, JASON ARON

6009 Memorial D

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

RILEY, KEVIN P.

4400 Post Oak P

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Defendant Lowe's Company Jury Demand

04/20/2020: Defendant Lowe's Company Jury Demand

Defendant Lowes Companies INCS AN IMPROPER PARTY TO THIS LAWSUIT ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

04/20/2020: Defendant Lowes Companies INCS AN IMPROPER PARTY TO THIS LAWSUIT ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

05/04/2020: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Proposed Order

05/07/2020: Proposed Order

Agreed Motion to Stay Litigation

05/07/2020: Agreed Motion to Stay Litigation

ORDER SIGNED STAYING PROCEEDINGS

05/08/2020: ORDER SIGNED STAYING PROCEEDINGS

Return of Service - LOWE'S COMPANIES INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION)

04/01/2020: Return of Service - LOWE'S COMPANIES INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION)

Return of Service- SADLER, WILLIAM M.

04/06/2020: Return of Service- SADLER, WILLIAM M.

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

03/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: CASE ABATED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED STAYING PROCEEDINGS; Order Signed: 5/8/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RILEY, KEVIN P.; Person Filing: LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LOWE'S COMPANIES INC (A FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 3/30/2020; Tracking: 73738827; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SADLER, WILLIAM M; Issued: 3/30/2020; Served: 4/3/2020; Tracking: 73738825; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ITKIN, JASON ARON; Person Filing: RODRIGUEZ, BABE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOWES COMPANIES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY, KEVIN P