This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:09:55 (UTC).

ROBERTSON, TOYAQUEE vs. JOHNSON, QUINESIA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 ROBERTSON, TOYAQUEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHNSON, QUINESIA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8392

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON, TOYAQUEE

Defendant

JOHNSON, QUINESIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKPAFFIONG, BASSEY OTU

Defendant Attorney

POWERS, JASON ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JASON ANDREW Person Filing - JOHNSON, QUINESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - AKPAFFIONG, BASSEY OTU Person Filing - ROBERTSON, TOYAQUEE

    Read MoreRead Less