This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/12/2022 at 05:29:39 (UTC).

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC vs. IN RE

Case Summary

On 02/03/2022 ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC filed an Other lawsuit against IN RE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7013

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC

Defendant

IN RE

Others

JONES, BANJAMIN

ROSARIO, ISAIAH

PIMENTEL, ALDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUIS, ALAN JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order on Petition Requesting Deposition

02/03/2022: Proposed Order on Petition Requesting Deposition

Exhibit F

02/03/2022: Exhibit F

Exhibit E

02/03/2022: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

02/03/2022: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

02/03/2022: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

02/03/2022: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

02/03/2022: Exhibit A

Petition Requesting Deposition to Investigate Potential Claim or Suit

02/03/2022: Petition Requesting Deposition to Investigate Potential Claim or Suit

Notice of Oral Hearing

02/08/2022: Notice of Oral Hearing

Affidavit of Service

02/17/2022: Affidavit of Service

Amended Notice of Oral Hearing

03/08/2022: Amended Notice of Oral Hearing

Affidavit of Service

03/22/2022: Affidavit of Service

Exhibit 6

04/04/2022: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 5

04/04/2022: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 4

04/04/2022: Exhibit 4

Exhibit 3-B

04/04/2022: Exhibit 3-B

Exhibit 3

04/04/2022: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

04/04/2022: Exhibit 2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED DENYING DEPOSITION APPEARANCE; Order Signed: 4/8/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: PERPETUATE TESTIMONY (MOTION TO); Results: Heard (No Ruling Made); Comments: TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT ON 4.7; Requesting Party: MARCUIS, ALAN JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARCUIS, ALAN JEFFREY; Person Filing: ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA ROBERT HALF FINANCE & ACCOUNTING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan J. Marcuis