This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/12/2021 at 08:00:30 (UTC).

RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC) vs. THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2016 RMX CONSTRUCTION INC DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION MCR DRYWALL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4576

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MCR DRYWALL

MCR CONSTRUCTION

RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC)

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC

Other

THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.

Defendant Attorney

DEWHURST, CHRISTIAN STUART

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FARIA, IAN PETER

 

Court Documents

DCA Generic Letter

02/08/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Certified Mail Receipt

03/17/2017: Certified Mail Receipt

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

03/31/2017: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Exhibit A

05/04/2017: Exhibit A

Designation of Experts

05/04/2017: Designation of Experts

Plaintiff's Desigantion of Testifying Expert Witness

05/05/2017: Plaintiff's Desigantion of Testifying Expert Witness

Rule 11 Agreement

06/07/2017: Rule 11 Agreement

Counter Defendant's Original Answer

07/18/2017: Counter Defendant's Original Answer

Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Business Record Affidavit

08/03/2017: Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Business Record Affidavit

Business Records Affidavit Of County Of Bend

08/03/2017: Business Records Affidavit Of County Of Bend

Rule 11 Agreement

08/03/2017: Rule 11 Agreement

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Experts

08/18/2017: Proposed Order Granting Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Experts

Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Designation of Experts

08/18/2017: Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Designation of Experts

Defendants First Amended Answer and Counterclaim

08/18/2017: Defendants First Amended Answer and Counterclaim

TRIAL SETTING

10/25/2017: TRIAL SETTING

Proposed Order

01/30/2018: Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution

01/30/2018: Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution

Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel Mediation

02/23/2018: Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel Mediation

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Case Settled; Comments: PER YEVERINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 9/27/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set; Comments: 10/01/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Results: Granted; Comments: PER S/O SIGNED 3.16.18; Requesting Party: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: MEDIATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/16/2018;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set; Comments: 2/05/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: MCR DRYWALL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/31/2017;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: ANSWER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: FARIA, IAN PETER; Person Filing: THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 4/19/2016; Tracking: 73238003; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: MCR DRYWALL;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: MCR CONSTRUCTION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less