This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/12/2021 at 08:00:30 (UTC).

RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC) vs. THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2016 RMX CONSTRUCTION INC DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION MCR DRYWALL INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS and CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4576

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

SYLVIA A. MATTHEWS

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MCR DRYWALL

MCR CONSTRUCTION

RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC)

112 W. 4Th Street

Houston, TX 77007

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC

Other

THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.

112 W. 4Th Str

Houston, TX 77007

YEVERINO, FRANK

Defendant Attorney

DEWHURST, CHRISTIAN STUART

600 Travis Sui

Houston, TX 77002

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FARIA, IAN P.

FARIA, IAN PETER

600 Travis Str

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

DCA Generic Letter

02/08/2017: DCA Generic Letter

Exhibit A

05/04/2017: Exhibit A

Rule 11 Agreement

06/07/2017: Rule 11 Agreement

Counter Defendant's Original Answer

07/18/2017: Counter Defendant's Original Answer

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Experts

08/18/2017: Proposed Order Granting Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Experts

Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Designation of Experts

08/18/2017: Defendants Objection to and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Designation of Experts

Defendants First Amended Answer and Counterclaim

08/18/2017: Defendants First Amended Answer and Counterclaim

TRIAL SETTING

10/25/2017: TRIAL SETTING

Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution

01/30/2018: Plaintiff's Motion to Refer Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution

MEDIATION ORDER SIGNED

03/16/2018: MEDIATION ORDER SIGNED

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance

05/04/2018: Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance

Agreed Motion for Continuance

05/04/2018: Agreed Motion for Continuance

Joint Motion to Dismiss

09/27/2018: Joint Motion to Dismiss

Plaintiff's Original Petition

04/13/2016: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6309 0325

04/19/2016: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7014 1820 0001 6309 0325

Domestic Return Receipt

04/27/2016: Domestic Return Receipt

Exhibit B

05/16/2016: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

05/16/2016: Exhibit A

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Case Settled; Comments: PER YEVERINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISMISSED ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES; Order Signed: 9/27/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set; Comments: 10/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; Results: Granted; Comments: PER S/O SIGNED 3.16.18; Requesting Party: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketDescription: MEDIATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/16/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits; Results: Re-Set; Comments: 2/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: MCR DRYWALL;

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/31/2017;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • HearingCourt: 281; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketDescription: COUNTER CLAIM; Filing Attorney: FARIA, IAN PETER; Person Filing: THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTUCTION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THOMPSON THRIFT CONSTRUCTION INC (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 4/19/2016; Tracking: 73238003; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: RMX CONSTRUCTION INC (DBA MCR CONSTRUCTION & MCR DRYWALL INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: MCR DRYWALL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R.; Person Filing: MCR CONSTRUCTION;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RMX CONSTRUCTION AAO VICKIE BRINSON is a litigant

Latest cases where MCR Construction is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEVERINO, FRANCISCO R