This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/04/2021 at 20:23:56 (UTC).

RIVERA, DEBANY (IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AND AS vs. CITY OF PASADENA

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 RIVERA, DEBANY IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AND AS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF PASADENA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are R. K. SANDILL and RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6012

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

R. K. SANDILL

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RIVERA, DEBANY (IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AND AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE

MARTINEZ, JUAN JAVIER (SR)

Defendants

SMITH, LONNIE (II)

Pasadena, TX 77502

LOCKMONDY, JOSEPH

Pasadena, TX 77506

MABES, ZACHARY

Pasadena, TX 77506

CITY OF PASADENA

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

HARDIN, MARK

Pasadena, TX 77506

WRIGHT, DONNA

Pasadena, TX 77506

PAZ, JESUS

Pasadena, TX 77506

DOVER, [FNU]

1201 Davis St

Pasadena, TX 77506

BENNETT, PAUL

Pasadena, TX 77506

DEVER, TIMOTHY

Others

PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

1515 Cherrybrook Lane

Pasadena, TX 77502

CITY OF PASADENA MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS MAYOR

Pasadena, TX 77506

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GABEL, CHRISTOPHER

GABEL, CHRISTOPHER AUGUSTINE

Defendant Attorney

HELFAND, WILLIAM SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Defendant City of Pasadena Texas Mabes Paz Lockmondy Hardin Wright Bennett and Dever Defenses Answer and Jury Demand

05/26/2020: Defendant City of Pasadena Texas Mabes Paz Lockmondy Hardin Wright Bennett and Dever Defenses Answer and Jury Demand

DEFENDANTS PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND LONNIE SMITH, II'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

05/28/2020: DEFENDANTS PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT AND LONNIE SMITH, II'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

Defendants' Notice of Removal

05/29/2020: Defendants' Notice of Removal

Defendants' City of Pasadena Texas Mabes Paz Lockmondy Hardin Wight Bennett and Dever Notice of Filing Removal

05/29/2020: Defendants' City of Pasadena Texas Mabes Paz Lockmondy Hardin Wight Bennett and Dever Notice of Filing Removal

Affidavit of Service (Pasadena ISD)

06/01/2020: Affidavit of Service (Pasadena ISD)

Affidavit of Service (City of Pasadena)

06/01/2020: Affidavit of Service (City of Pasadena)

Affidavit of Service (Lonnie Smith)

06/01/2020: Affidavit of Service (Lonnie Smith)

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

04/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST

04/27/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: MABES, ZACHARY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: SMITH, LONNIE (II);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: PAZ, JESUS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: HARDIN, MARK;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: LOCKMONDY, JOSEPH;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: BENNETT, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: WRIGHT, DONNA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REJDA-PONCE, CARMEN JO; Person Filing: PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WRIGHT, DONNA; Issued: 4/30/2020; Tracking: 73746019; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARDIN, MARK; Issued: 4/30/2020; Tracking: 73746018; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LOCKMONDY, JOSEPH; Issued: 4/30/2020; Tracking: 73746017; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PAZ, JESUS; Issued: 4/30/2020; Tracking: 73746016; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MABES, ZACHARY; Issued: 4/30/2020; Tracking: 73746015; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMITH, LONNIE (II); Issued: 4/30/2020; Served: 5/5/2020; Tracking: 73746014; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 4/30/2020; Served: 5/5/2020; Tracking: 73746013; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CITY OF PASADENA MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS MAYOR; Issued: 4/30/2020; Served: 5/5/2020; Tracking: 73746011; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GABEL, CHRISTOPHER AUGUSTINE; Person Filing: RIVERA, DEBANY (IN HER INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AND AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GABEL, CHRISTOPHER AUGUSTINE; Person Filing: MARTINEZ, JUAN JAVIER (SR);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOVER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PASADENA INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant