This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:33:11 (UTC).

FONTENOT, JANNIFER (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF vs. SHAPIRO, LEON DAVID

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 FONTENOT, JANNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHAPIRO, LEON DAVID. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1643

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF CHASONIQUE RICHARDSON( DECSD), JANNIFER RICHARDSON INDIV. AND

RICHARDSON, JANNIFER

RICHARDSON, JANNIFER (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE

FONTENOT, JANNIFER (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF

ESTATE OF CHASONIQUE RICHARDSON (DECEASED)

Defendant

SHAPIRO, LEON DAVID

Friendswood, TX 77546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID

1225 North Loop

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

BLANCHETTE, ROBIN NICOLE

2929 Allen Park

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

DEFENDNATS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND

06/09/2020: DEFENDNATS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Change The Style Of Case

06/10/2020: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Change The Style Of Case

Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Change The Style Of Case

06/10/2020: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Change The Style Of Case

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING AMENDED /CORRECTED CAPTION

06/17/2020: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING AMENDED /CORRECTED CAPTION

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition & Request for Disclosure

20.05.27.Civil Process Request Harris Cty .Amended

05/27/2020: 20.05.27.Civil Process Request Harris Cty .Amended

20.5.27 Plaintiff's First Amended Petition RFD

05/27/2020: 20.5.27 Plaintiff's First Amended Petition RFD

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING AMENDED /CORRECTED CAPTION; Order Signed: 6/17/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLANCHETTE, ROBIN NICOLE; Person Filing: SHAPIRO, LEON DAVID;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHAPIRO, LEON DAVID; Issued: 6/1/2020; Tracking: 73754165; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: ESTATE OF CHASONIQUE RICHARDSON (DECEASED);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: RICHARDSON, JANNIFER (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHAPIRO, LEON DAVID; Issued: 6/4/2020; Tracking: 73755476; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: RICHARDSON, JANNIFER (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BURKHALTER, JAMES DAVID; Person Filing: FONTENOT, JANNIFER (INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF;

    Read MoreRead Less