This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:20:42 (UTC).

RICHARD, WILTON vs. QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 RICHARD, WILTON filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against QUIGLEY COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******678H

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD, WILTON

Defendants

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD

AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY (FKA PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION)

PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION

AMERICAN OIL COMPANY (FKA AMOCO OIL COMPANY)

AMOCO INC

AMM LUMUS GLOBAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

AMETEK INC

AMF INCORPORATED

AQU CHEM INC

ATOFINA PETROCHEMICALS INC (FKA FINA OIL AND CHEMICAL COMPANY)

FINA OIL AND CHEMICAL COMPANY

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC

BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION

BECHTEL CONSTRUCTION OPERATIONS INC

BECHTEL CORPORATION

BECTHEL ENERGY CORPORATION

BECTHEL ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDOX, MARILYN NIX

Defendant Attorney

BLAZEK, PAULA H

Other Attorneys

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • ANSWER SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • ANSWER SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • ANSWER SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • ANSWER SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (D/B/A UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • SEVENTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DIXON, DAVID ALLEN Person Filing - RICHARD, WILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - MADDOX, MARILYN NIX Person Filing - RICHARD, WILTON

    Read MoreRead Less