This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/08/2015 at 00:40:17 (UTC).

RICE, LARRY PRENTIS vs. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (IND AND AS

Case Summary

On 01/07/2005 RICE, LARRY PRENTIS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION IND AND AS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1475

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2005

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

RICE, LARRY PRENTIS

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

RICE, LINDA

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INC (DBA AMERICAN STANDARD PRODUCTS INC) (IND AND AS

GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED (DELAWARE CORPORATION)

RICE, LINDA (REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF LARRY PRENTIS RICE)

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

AQUA-CHEM INC (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

GLEN ALDEN CORPORATION

GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC (CORPORATION) (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC (AKA AND SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO ERIE CITY IRON

ERIE CITY IRON WORKS

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC (IND AND AS A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

HERCULES INC

RILEY POWER INC (FKA BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC FKA D B RILEY INC FKA

62 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

COTTEN, CHAD RUSSELL

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

RHODES, KENNETH D.

WADE, TODD N.

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

MAYFIELD, JORDAN ALEXANDER

FULLER, L. HAYES III

WHITE, CLAY M.

MOIR, PETER A.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

Other Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

VANCLEAVE, MARK DEAN

REA, PAM

KINSEL, J. FRANK JR.

WARE, JAMES L.

12 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2014
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2007
  • ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC (DBA AMERICAN STANDARD PRODUCTS INC) (IND AND AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (IND AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - AMERICAN STANDARD INC (DBA AMERICAN STANDARD PRODUCTS INC) (IND AND AS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KINSEL, J. FRANK JR. Person Filing - HENRY VOGT MACHINE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAPSCOTT, WILLIAM KEN JR. Person Filing - RICE, LINDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAPSCOTT, WILLIAM KEN JR. Person Filing - RICE, LARRY PRENTIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less