This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/30/2020 at 21:52:19 (UTC).

RICE, ERIC vs. "THAT BAR" (A TEXAS COMPANY)

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 RICE, ERIC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THAT BAR A TEXAS COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3626

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICE, ERIC

Defendant

"THAT BAR" (A TEXAS COMPANY)

Other

"THAT BAR" BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT STEVEN WAYNE JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DASPIT, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

Plantiffs First set interrogatories Requests For Production Request for admission and request for disclosures to defendant

09/11/2015: Plantiffs First set interrogatories Requests For Production Request for admission and request for disclosures to defendant

Civil Process Request

09/11/2015: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information Sheet

09/11/2015: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plantiff's Original Petition and First Set of Discovery

09/11/2015: Plantiff's Original Petition and First Set of Discovery

DCA Generic Letter

02/02/2016: DCA Generic Letter

Notice of Hearing

02/09/2016: Notice of Hearing

Exhibit B

02/09/2016: Exhibit B

Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

02/09/2016: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment

Amended Notice of Hearing

03/07/2016: Amended Notice of Hearing

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO ANSWER FILED

03/15/2016: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO ANSWER FILED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

04/12/2016: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS - NO FINAL ORDER

Exhibit 09

05/19/2016: Exhibit 09

Exhibit 06

05/19/2016: Exhibit 06

Exhibit 04

05/19/2016: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 03

05/19/2016: Exhibit 03

Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Business Record Affadivits

05/19/2016: Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Business Record Affadivits

DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

05/23/2016: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED

Court Reporter Exhibit List

06/27/2016: Court Reporter Exhibit List

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/23/2016

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; Results: Granted; Comments: O/S 5/23/16; Requesting Party: DASPIT, JOHN A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2016

DocketDescription: NO COSTS ALLOCATED;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2016

DocketDescription: DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/24/2016;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2016

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Submission Docket (Local Rule 12); Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Passed; Comments: DISPOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2016

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: N/A BY ATP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2016

DocketDescription: HOLD FOR JUDGMENT;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2016

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239); Results: Granted; Comments: O/S 4/4/16; Requesting Party: KRAMER, EVAN NICHOLAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2016

DocketDescription: INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 4/4/2016;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2016

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: DEFAULT - MOTION FOR (TRCP 239); Results: No Appearance; Requesting Party: KRAMER, EVAN NICHOLAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2016

HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DISMISS FOR WANT OF PROSECU-MTN TO (TRCP 165A); Results: Re-Set; Comments: EXT TO 4/11 ORAL HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2015

DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: "THAT BAR" BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT STEVEN WAYNE JOHNSON; Issued: 9/11/2015; Served: 10/10/2015; Returned: 2/9/2016; Tracking: 73167661; Deliver To: CIV AGCY-CIVILIAN SERVICE AGENCY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2015

DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2015

DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DASPIT, JOHN A; Person Filing: RICE, ERIC;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less