This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:43:53 (UTC).

RHODES, JESSE HOLLIS JR vs. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 RHODES, JESSE HOLLIS JR filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1277

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

RHODES, JESSE HOLLIS JR

BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION (FKA BORG-WARNER CORPORATION)

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AQUA CHEM INC

CERTAIN CORP

CHAMPLAIN CABLE CO

DANA CORP

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP

GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORP

KELLY-MOORE

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

OWENS ILLINOIS INC

RILEY POWER INC

UNION CARBIDE CORP

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

CRANE COMPANY

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

JACKSON, D. LEANNE

PHIFER, ELIZABETH L.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

WHITE, CLAY M.

BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

MOIR, PETER A.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

FRASE, LAURA ANN

Other Attorneys

HENDRYX, MICHAEL

KINSEL, J. FRANK JR.

ALEXANDER, WILLIAM WARD JR.

WRIGHT, DAWN MARIE

TAYLOR, DAVID M.

TOMASINO, JUAN CARLOS

BLIZZARD, JOSEPH

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAYLOR, DAVID M. Person Filing - 3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY AKA "3M")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TAYLOR, DAVID M. Person Filing - MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PHIFER, ELIZABETH L. Person Filing - BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION (FKA BORG-WARNER CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WADE, TODD N. Person Filing - KELLY-MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BAILEY, MELVIN DAVID Person Filing - GEORGIA PACIFIC CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLIZZARD, JOSEPH Person Filing - RAPID AMERICAN CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MOIR, PETER A. Person Filing - OWENS ILLINOIS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JACKSON, D. LEANNE Person Filing - RHODES, JESSE HOLLIS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - DANA CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ELLISTON, GARY D. Person Filing - CERTAINEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JACKSON, D. LEANNE Person Filing - RHODES, JESSE HOLLIS JR

    Read MoreRead Less