This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:38:22 (UTC).

RESCOM MINERAL TRADING FZE vs. BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 RESCOM MINERAL TRADING FZE filed an Other lawsuit against BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9705

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESCOM MINERAL TRADING FZE

Defendant

BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS LLC

Other

BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POGACH, ADAM DAVID

 

Court Documents

Proposed ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PETITION FOR DEPOSITION TO INVESTIGATE POTENTIAL CLAIMS

07/06/2020: Proposed ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PETITION FOR DEPOSITION TO INVESTIGATE POTENTIAL CLAIMS

Exhibit 01

07/06/2020: Exhibit 01

Civil Case Information Sheet

07/06/2020: Civil Case Information Sheet

VERIFIED PETITION FOR DEPOSITION TO INVESTIGATE POTENTIAL CLAIMS

07/06/2020: VERIFIED PETITION FOR DEPOSITION TO INVESTIGATE POTENTIAL CLAIMS

Request for Issuance of Service

07/09/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 7/15/2020; Tracking: 73767793; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: POGACH, ADAM DAVID; Person Filing: RESCOM MINERAL TRADING FZE;

    Read MoreRead Less