Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:36:30 (UTC).

REED, BARBARA vs. FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 REED, BARBARA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9449

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED, BARBARA

Defendants

FAMILY DOLLAR INC

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC

DOLLAR TREE INC

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

FAMILY DOLLAR OF TEXAS LP

Others

FAMILY DOLLAR INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LP MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED

Austin, TX 78701

DOLLAR TREE INC (FOREIGN FOR PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERCHELMANN, RYAN NICHOLAS

12777 Jones Road

Houston, TX 77070

Defendant Attorney

RINEY, KENNETH C.

901 Main Stree

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

Defendants' First Amended Answer

04/22/2020: Defendants' First Amended Answer

Exhibit A

04/23/2020: Exhibit A

Defendants' Notice That Action Has Been Removed

04/23/2020: Defendants' Notice That Action Has Been Removed

Citation (Family Dollar Stores of Texas LLC)

04/03/2020: Citation (Family Dollar Stores of Texas LLC)

Citation (Family Dollar Stores fo Texas LP)

04/03/2020: Citation (Family Dollar Stores fo Texas LP)

Citation (Dollar Tree Stores Inc)

04/03/2020: Citation (Dollar Tree Stores Inc)

Citation (Dollar Tree Inc)

04/03/2020: Citation (Dollar Tree Inc)

Citation (Family Dollar Inc)

04/03/2020: Citation (Family Dollar Inc)

Defendant's Original Answer

04/17/2020: Defendant's Original Answer

Civil Process Request Form

03/26/2020: Civil Process Request Form

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: DOLLAR TREE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: FAMILY DOLLAR INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: FAMILY DOLLAR INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: DOLLAR TREE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RINEY, KENNETH C.; Person Filing: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LP MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738585; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738583; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FAMILY DOLLAR INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738582; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: DOLLAR TREE INC (FOREIGN FOR PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH; Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738580; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 3/27/2020; Served: 3/27/2020; Tracking: 73738577; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BERCHELMANN, RYAN NICHOLAS; Person Filing: REED, BARBARA;

    Read MoreRead Less