This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/10/2019 at 07:35:44 (UTC).

RECIF RESOURCES LLC vs. JUNIPER CAPITAL ADVISORS L P (D/B/A JUNIPER CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC)

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 RECIF RESOURCES LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JUNIPER CAPITAL ADVISORS L P D/B/A JUNIPER CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4420

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RECIF RESOURCES LLC

Others and Defendants

JUNIPER CAPITAL ADVISORS L P (D/B/A JUNIPER CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC)

2323 S Shepherd Drive Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77019

JUNIPER CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NUNNALLY, KEVIN KNOX

2929 Allen Park

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

ZEVE, ANDREW WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

01/18/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Plaintiff Recif Resources LLC's Reply Support of Application for Temporary Injunction

01/30/2019: Plaintiff Recif Resources LLC's Reply Support of Application for Temporary Injunction

Exhibit 8

01/30/2019: Exhibit 8

Exhibit 7

01/30/2019: Exhibit 7

Exhibit 6

01/30/2019: Exhibit 6

Exhibit 5

01/30/2019: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 2

01/30/2019: Exhibit 2

Exhibit 14

01/30/2019: Exhibit 14

Exhibit 12

01/30/2019: Exhibit 12

Exhibit 1

01/30/2019: Exhibit 1

Juniper Capital Advisors LP's Response in Oppostion to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Injunction

01/30/2019: Juniper Capital Advisors LP's Response in Oppostion to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Injunction

Original Answer & Counterclaim

02/08/2019: Original Answer & Counterclaim

Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant

01/17/2019: Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant

Exhibit E

01/17/2019: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

01/17/2019: Exhibit D

Exhibit B

01/17/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit 1

01/17/2019: Exhibit 1

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

01/18/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 1/18/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 1/18/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 1/18/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: NUNNALLY, KEVIN KNOX; Person Filing: RECIF RESOURCES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less