This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/21/2020 at 08:01:01 (UTC).

RAWLS, SANDRA vs. E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 RAWLS, SANDRA filed an Other lawsuit against E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1942

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAWLS, SANDRA

Defendants

E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY

GUARD-LINE INC

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

5220 Texas Ave

Houston, TX 77011

AMF INCORPORATED

4520 CORP INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BENJAMIN F SHAW

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Other and Defendant

4520 CORP INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BENJAMIN F SHAW

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY, TINA MARIE HAMILTON

316 N. 13Th St

Nederland, TX 77627

 

Court Documents

First amended petition to perpetuate testimony

05/28/2020: First amended petition to perpetuate testimony

Civil process request form

05/28/2020: Civil process request form

Order

05/28/2020: Order

Notice of Transfer under Rule 13 of Tag Along Case

05/27/2020: Notice of Transfer under Rule 13 of Tag Along Case

Exhibit A

05/27/2020: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

05/27/2020: Exhibit B

ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY

06/05/2020: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY

Petitioner's Notice Of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Against Defendant, Able Supply Co.

06/01/2020: Petitioner's Notice Of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Against Defendant, Able Supply Co.

Cover letter

06/01/2020: Cover letter

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

06/01/2020: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY; Order Signed: 6/5/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY; Order Signed: 6/5/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY; Order Signed: 6/5/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY; Order Signed: 6/5/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING MTN TO PERPETUATE TESTIMONY; Order Signed: 6/4/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 6/1/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 4520 CORP INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BENJAMIN F SHAW; Issued: 6/2/2020; Tracking: 73754740; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADLEY, TINA MARIE HAMILTON; Person Filing: RAWLS, SANDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BRADLEY, TINA MARIE HAMILTON; Person Filing: RAWLS, SANDRA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUARD-LINE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Blount International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMF INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant