This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:08:25 (UTC).

RAMSEY, CLARENCE WAYNE vs. AMETEK LLC

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 RAMSEY, CLARENCE WAYNE filed an Other lawsuit against AMETEK LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL GOMEZ and KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6240

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL GOMEZ

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMSEY, CLARENCE WAYNE

Defendants

AMETEK LLC

ASHLAND LLC

BW/IP INC

CHAMPAIN CABLE CORPORATION

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

CRANE CO

COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

FOSECO INC

GARDNER DENVER NASH LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

GUARD-LINE INC

HERCULES LLC

INSUL COMPANY INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

PEERLESS INDUSTRIES INC

PRECISION CASTPARTS CORP

TEXAS GASKET AND PACKING COMPANY

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CABUTTO, LAURA MONDELLO

Defendant Attorneys

ELLISTON, GARY D.

AVILES, ARTURO M.

WILLIAMS, PAMELA JEAN NEALE

STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER MARIE

BUCHANAN, ANGELA MARIE

MURPHY, MITCHELL M

MURPHY, MITCHELL MADDOX

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

LURATE, BIANCA BARI

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

FLORENCE, KIRK TODD

SOLOMON, KIMBERLY ERIN MARKS

BROWN, GREGG R.

Other Attorneys

TERRY, MICHAEL G.

RAHMAN, LAURA SPADAFORA

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a the Duriron Company, Inc.

07/13/2022: Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a the Duriron Company, Inc.

Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a the Duriron Company, Inc.

07/13/2022: Agreed Motion to Substitute Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a the Duriron Company, Inc.

ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

07/18/2022: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

Notice of Change of Law Firm Affiliation for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.

03/09/2022: Notice of Change of Law Firm Affiliation for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.

Defendant Hercules LLC's Initial Disclosures

03/17/2022: Defendant Hercules LLC's Initial Disclosures

Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Initial Disclosures

03/17/2022: Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Initial Disclosures

Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures

03/17/2022: Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures

Defendant Hercules LLC's Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses

03/18/2022: Defendant Hercules LLC's Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses

Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses

03/18/2022: Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses

Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses

03/18/2022: Defendant Ametek, Inc.'s Designation of Fact and Expert Witnesses

ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

11/29/2021: ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED

DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.S, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, AND SUBJECT THERETO ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED ASBESTOS PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSS-CLAIMS, AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSSCLAIMS

10/29/2021: DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.S, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, AND SUBJECT THERETO ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED ASBESTOS PETITION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSS-CLAIMS, AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSSCLAIMS

NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

08/31/2021: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

Plaintiff's Notice Of Partial NonSuit Without Prejudice

08/31/2021: Plaintiff's Notice Of Partial NonSuit Without Prejudice

Ametek, Inc., Ashland LLC, Champlain Cable Corpora

09/02/2021: Ametek, Inc., Ashland LLC, Champlain Cable Corpora

Defendant Insul Company, Inc.'s Special Exceptions, Original Answer, Motion For Bifurcated Trial and Answer To Cross-Actions

09/03/2021: Defendant Insul Company, Inc.'s Special Exceptions, Original Answer, Motion For Bifurcated Trial and Answer To Cross-Actions

DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

09/21/2021: DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY

Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Notice of Adoption Of Discovery Responses, Designation Of Fact and Expert Witnesses, and Responses To Plaintiff's Request For Disclosure Filed In In Rd: Asbestos Litigation

09/21/2021: Defendant Champlain Cable Corporation's Notice of Adoption Of Discovery Responses, Designation Of Fact and Expert Witnesses, and Responses To Plaintiff's Request For Disclosure Filed In In Rd: Asbestos Litigation

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD; Order Signed: 7/18/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/29/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SUMMARY JUDGMENT-FINAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A); Results: Granted; Requesting Party: TERRY, MICHAEL G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: SUMMARY JUDGMENT-FINAL (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 166A); Results: Hearing Held; Comments: RSET CONT. GRANTED; Requesting Party: TERRY, MICHAEL G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS; Person Filing: FOSECO INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 10/21/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingCourt: 888; Docket Type: Trial Motion Docket - Rule 13 Asbestosis; Reason: CONTINUANCE (MOTION FOR) (FAMILY); Results: Hearing Held; Requesting Party: CABUTTO, LAURA MONDELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 10/12/2021; Served: 10/13/2021; Tracking: 73926697; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CABUTTO, LAURA MONDELLO; Person Filing: RAMSEY, CLARENCE WAYNE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BROWN, GREGG R.; Person Filing: TEXAS GASKET AND PACKING COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT C T; Issued: 5/3/2021; Served: 5/5/2021; Received: 5/10/2021; Tracking: 73866829; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CRANE CO BY SEVNG ITS REGISTERED AGENT C T CORPORATION SYSTEM C T; Issued: 5/3/2021; Served: 5/5/2021; Received: 5/10/2021; Tracking: 73866827; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT THE CORPORATION; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73866824; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHAMPLAIN CABLE CORPORATION BY SERVIG ITS REGISTERED AGENT CHARLIE; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73866823; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (FKA COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION); Issued: 5/3/2021; Served: 5/5/2021; Received: 5/10/2021; Tracking: 73866821; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BW/IP INC AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 5/3/2021; Tracking: 73866820; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASHLAND LLC (FKA ASHLAND INC) BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT C T; Issued: 5/3/2021; Served: 5/5/2021; Received: 5/10/2021; Tracking: 73866814; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMETEK INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CORPORATION SERVICE; Issued: 5/3/2021; Served: 5/6/2021; Received: 5/11/2021; Tracking: 73866810; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CABUTTO, LAURA MONDELLO; Person Filing: RAMSEY, CLARENCE WAYNE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEERLESS INDUSTRIAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where INSUL COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDNER DENVER NASH, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cooper Industries, Inc. is a litigant