This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/28/2021 at 07:51:04 (UTC).

RAMSEY, BRIAN RUSSELL vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 RAMSEY, BRIAN RUSSELL filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RAVI K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4448

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RAVI K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMSEY, BRIAN RUSSELL

Defendants and Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE

209 W. 14Th St.,

Austin, TX 78701

RE:SEARCH TX- OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRATION

HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT 5

17423 Katy Freeway,

Houston, TX 77094

HARRIS COUNTY CRIMINAL COURT AT LAW NO 14

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

1201 Franklin St Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

102 San Jacinto St

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

Po Box 4651

Houston, TX 77210

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis St 16Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

ALL CRIMINAL COURTS

1201 Franklin St 11Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONDON, YVONNE MELISSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingCourt: 127; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR); Requesting Party: LONDON, YVONNE MELISSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 10/5/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LONDON, YVONNE MELISSA; Person Filing: RAMSEY, BRIAN RUSSELL;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF COURT ADMINISTRACTION SERVICING MARGIE JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL CRIMINAL COURTS BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CRIMINAL COURT AT LAW NO. 14 is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY CONSTABLE PRECINCT 4 is a litigant