This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/22/2018 at 16:54:12 (UTC).

RAMIREZ, OSCAR vs. OHANA, ZION

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 RAMIREZ, OSCAR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OHANA, ZION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BILL R. BURKE JR.. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2978

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BILL R. BURKE JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARA-FLORES, CORONADO

RAMIREZ, OSCAR

MATA-SALDANA, MIGUEL

Defendants

BHAKTA, MAYUR

Humble, TX 77396

VILLATORO, FRANCISCA

Houston, TX 77036

TEX OSHER LLC

OHANA, ZION

Houston, TX 77057

Other

TEX OSHER LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) BY SERVING THE REGISTERED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCOS, JAVIER JR.

Defendant Attorneys

TRUEHEART, JOHN H. JR.

SEDITA, FRANK ALLAN

GROSSMAN, STEVEN D.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs' Original Petition

01/15/2016: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

01/20/2016: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Citation

02/03/2016: Citation

Filing Letter

02/04/2016: Filing Letter

Original Answer

02/17/2016: Original Answer

Citation

02/23/2016: Citation

Defendant, Villatoro's Unopposed Motion to Sever

03/08/2016: Defendant, Villatoro's Unopposed Motion to Sever

Cover Letter

03/09/2016: Cover Letter

Verification

02/14/2017: Verification

TRIAL SETTING

06/23/2017: TRIAL SETTING

Proposed Order

09/15/2017: Proposed Order

Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance

09/15/2017: Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance

ORDER RESETTING TRIAL

09/20/2017: ORDER RESETTING TRIAL

Proposed Order

01/03/2018: Proposed Order

Defendant, Mayur Bjakta's Motion for Continuance

01/03/2018: Defendant, Mayur Bjakta's Motion for Continuance

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

01/24/2018: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Proposed Order - Joint Motion for Continuance

04/20/2018: Proposed Order - Joint Motion for Continuance

Verification - Joint Motion for Continuance

04/20/2018: Verification - Joint Motion for Continuance

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Description: SEVERANCE ORDER SIGNED, PARTY REMOVED; Order Signed: 3/9/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Description: MOTION FOR SEVERANCE GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SEDITA, FRANK ALLAN; Person Filing: VILLATORO, FRANCISCA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROSSMAN, STEVEN D.; Person Filing: OHANA, ZION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GROSSMAN, STEVEN D.; Person Filing: TEX OSHER LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TRUEHEART, JOHN H. JR.; Person Filing: BHAKTA, MAYUR;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARCOS, JAVIER JR.; Person Filing: LARA-FLORES, CORONADO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARCOS, JAVIER JR.; Person Filing: MATA-SALDANA, MIGUEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MARCOS, JAVIER JR.; Person Filing: RAMIREZ, OSCAR;

    Read MoreRead Less