This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:26:02 (UTC).

RAHMAN, KHANDAKER vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 RAHMAN, KHANDAKER filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE H PALMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5794

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE H PALMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAHMAN, KHANDAKER

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS

OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION

205 W 14Th Street Suite 600,

Austin, TX 78701

Others

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

201 Caroline 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE

500 Jefferson Suite 600

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker St

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS

1200 Travis 16Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD

49 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, H. ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • HearingCourt: 215; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: OCA EXPUNCTIONS - LEGAL DIVISION; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73883848; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880372; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880371; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880369; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING DEIDRE HARRIS; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880368; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880367; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE BY SERVING BRIAN L ROSE; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880365; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 6/24/2021; Tracking: 73880364; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/18/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: RAHMAN, KHANDAKER;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCA EXPUNCTIONS- LEGAL DIVISIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY SUPERVISION AND CORRECTIONS BY SERVING DR TERESA MAY PHD is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant