This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:12:39 (UTC).

QUIROS, RALPH (IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF vs. MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 QUIROS, RALPH IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8488

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

QUIROS, RALPH (IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF ROSAIDA QUIROS RAPHAEL QUIROS

QUIROS, MARTHA (IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF ROSAIDA QUIROS RAPHAEL

QUIROS, RAPHAEL (MINOR)

QUIROS, ALICIA (MINOR)

WEST OAKS AUTO PLAZA INC

QUIROS, ROSAIDA (MINOR)

QUIROS, RALPH (INDIVIDUALLY AND ANF ANA BERTA QUIROS AND

QUIROS, MARTHA (INDIVIDUALLY AND ANF ANA BERTA QUIROS AND

QUIROS, ANA BERTA (MINOR)

QUIROS, LUZ MARIA (MINOR)

MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

MICHELIN AMERICAS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARD, JOHN PHILLIP

HOUSSIERE, CHARLES R. III

Defendant Attorneys

RAMEY, ROBERT L.

BULLION, THOMAS M. III

DAY, DWAYNE RICHARD

HUDDLESTON, JOHN ALEX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2010
  • ORDER SIGNED ESTABLISHING TRUST FUND ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • ORDER DEPOSITING FUNDS INTO REGISTRY SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • MOTION FOR MINOR SETTLEMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT(S) SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED, CASE RETAINED ON DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2007
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - BULLION, THOMAS M. III Person Filing - MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCFARLAND, GRANT T. Person Filing - FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BULLION, THOMAS M. III Person Filing - MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARD, JOHN PHILLIP Person Filing - QUIROS, ALICIA (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARD, JOHN PHILLIP Person Filing - QUIROS, RALPH (IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF ROSAIDA QUIROS RAPHAEL QUIROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARD, JOHN PHILLIP Person Filing - QUIROS, RAPHAEL (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARD, JOHN PHILLIP Person Filing - QUIROS, MARTHA (IND AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF ROSAIDA QUIROS RAPHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CARD, JOHN PHILLIP Person Filing - QUIROS, ROSAIDA (MINOR)

    Read MoreRead Less