This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/17/2022 at 05:04:18 (UTC).

QUEZADA, FROYLAN vs. 3M COMPANY (AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING C

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 QUEZADA, FROYLAN filed an Other lawsuit against 3M COMPANY AKA MINNESOTA MINING MANUFACTURING C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are BEAU MILLER and KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3115

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

BEAU MILLER

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUEZADA, FROYLAN

QUEZADA, QUADALUPE

Defendants

3M COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ANCO INSULATIONS INC

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC

BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC

CAMERON INTERNATION CORPORATION

CHEVRON USA INC

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC

CRANE CO

E.I. DU POINT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY

3M COMPANY (AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

AFTON PUMPS INC

BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC (FKA AMOCO CORPORATION FKA ARCO A

A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

BW/IP INTERNATIONAL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK

Other Attorneys

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

ELLISTON, GARY D.

 

Court Documents

Defendant Riley Power Inc.F/K/A Riley Stoker Corporation and D.B. Riley, INC'S Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims On The Basis Of Forum Non Conveniens; and, Subject To and Without Waiving Foregoing, Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury

01/07/2022: Defendant Riley Power Inc.F/K/A Riley Stoker Corporation and D.B. Riley, INC'S Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims On The Basis Of Forum Non Conveniens; and, Subject To and Without Waiving Foregoing, Answer To Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Dema

DEFENDANT CLEAVER BROOKS, INC f/k/a AQUA-CHEM, INC. d/b/a CLEAVERBROOKS DIVISIONS SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND, SUBJECT THERETO, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITIO

01/10/2022: DEFENDANT CLEAVER BROOKS, INC f/k/a AQUA-CHEM, INC. d/b/a CLEAVERBROOKS DIVISIONS SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND, SUBJECT THERETO, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION,

Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Defendant Cleaver-Brook F/K/A Aqua-Chem, INC. D/B/A Cleaver-Brook Division

01/24/2022: Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Defendant Cleaver-Brook F/K/A Aqua-Chem, INC. D/B/A Cleaver-Brook Division

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Jury Demand

12/23/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Jury Demand

2021/11/30 Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

12/23/2021: 2021/11/30 Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

12/23/2021: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Docket Sheet

12/23/2021: Docket Sheet

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

CITATION

12/23/2021: CITATION

Citation

12/23/2021: Citation

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: CASE CONSOLIDATION ACCOMPLISHED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS; Person Filing: CLEAVER-BROOKS INC (FKA AQUA-CHEM INC DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: RILEY POWER INC (FKA RILEY STOKER CORPORATION AND D B RILEY INC SUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: QUEZADA, FROYLAN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: QUEZADA, QUADALUPE;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFTON PUMPS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAVER BROOKS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Eastman Chemical Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ANCO INSULATION INC is a litigant