This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/06/2019 at 07:37:03 (UTC).

QUENTEL, MANFRED vs. WEST LAKE BUSINESS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 QUENTEL, MANFRED filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WEST LAKE BUSINESS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LARRY WEIMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8606

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LARRY WEIMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANON, VICTOR

QUENTEL, MANFRED

Defendant

WEST LAKE BUSINESS LLC

Other

WEST LAKE BUSINESS LLC (LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPURLOCK, KIMBERLEY M

17280 West Lake

Humble, TX 77346

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

03/14/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

03/15/2019: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Proposed Order Extending Temporary Restraining ORder

03/25/2019: Proposed Order Extending Temporary Restraining ORder

Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

03/25/2019: Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Return

03/26/2019: Temporary Restraining Order Return

Agreed Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

03/27/2019: Agreed Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

03/28/2019: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

03/13/2019: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit E

03/13/2019: Exhibit E

Exhibit D

03/13/2019: Exhibit D

Exhibit C

03/13/2019: Exhibit C

Exhibit B

03/13/2019: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

03/13/2019: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

03/13/2019: Civil Process Request

Affidavit

03/13/2019: Affidavit

Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction

03/13/2019: Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

03/14/2019: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

03/14/2019: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/28/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/14/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 3/14/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 3/14/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPURLOCK, KIMBERLEY M; Person Filing: QUENTEL, MANFRED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPURLOCK, KIMBERLEY M; Person Filing: MANON, VICTOR;

    Read MoreRead Less