This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:56:04 (UTC).

QUALITY PALLET CORPORATION vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 QUALITY PALLET CORPORATION filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2701

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY PALLET CORPORATION

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY)

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEATING, LANDON STEPHON

Defendant Attorney

TORRES, HOLLY K

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

01/14/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

02/25/2022: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Defendants Original Answer

02/10/2022: Defendants Original Answer

Domestic Return Receipt

02/02/2022: Domestic Return Receipt

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0782 0965

01/18/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0782 0965

Certified Mail Receipt

01/18/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2023
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 2/25/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TORRES, HOLLY K; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT (A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY); Issued: 1/18/2022; Served: 1/20/2022; Tracking: 73961401; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KEATING, LANDON STEPHON; Person Filing: QUALITY PALLET CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant