This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/19/2021 at 07:39:09 (UTC).

PROLOGIS LP vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 PROLOGIS LP filed an Other lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL GOMEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3798

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL GOMEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROLOGIS LP

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY SERVING

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUMAS, BRITTANY E.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION FOR REVIEW OF APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD ORDER

08/26/2021: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION FOR REVIEW OF APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD ORDER

Exhibit A

08/26/2021: Exhibit A

Letter Regarding Citation Request

08/26/2021: Letter Regarding Citation Request

Return of Service

09/03/2021: Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY SERVING; Issued: 8/27/2021; Served: 9/2/2021; Received: 9/3/2021; Tracking: 73907566; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DUMAS, BRITTANY ELIZABETH; Person Filing: PROLOGIS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROLOGIS, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany E. Dumas