This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/17/2021 at 07:45:25 (UTC).

PROLOGIS LP vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 PROLOGIS LP filed an Other lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3305

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROLOGIS LP

Defendant and Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATTERS, KEVIN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order

08/24/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition for Review of Appraisal Review Board Order

EXHIBIT A

08/24/2021: EXHIBIT A

Request for Issuance of Service

08/24/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Return of Service-HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

09/03/2021: Return of Service-HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT; Issued: 9/1/2021; Served: 9/2/2021; Received: 9/7/2021; Tracking: 73908916; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WATTERS, KEVIN CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: PROLOGIS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROLOGIS, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATTERS, KEVIN CHRISTOPHER