This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/21/2015 at 13:03:38 (UTC).

PROCTOR, PAUL D vs. QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2004 PROCTOR, PAUL D filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against QUIGLEY COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******332K

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROCTOR, PAUL D

PROCTOR, FAIRY ANN

Defendants

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

4520 CORP

A M F INCORPORATED

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AIR LIQUIDE AMERICA CORPORATION

AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS INC

AK STEEL CORPORATION

ALCOA INC

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AMF INCORPORATED

AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY

AMOCO OIL COMPANY

ANADARKO E & P COMPANY LP (FKA UNION PACIFIC RESOURCES COMPANY FKA

UNION PACIFIC RESOURCES COMPANY

CHAMPLAIN PETROLEUM COMPANY

ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY

ANHEUSER-BUSCH INCORPORATED

136 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLOUD, IAN PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

HENRY, LESLIE M.

THACKSTON, ROBERT EDWIN

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

Other Attorneys

POWERS, JAMES H.

EASTER, LAURIE BLAZEK

PIPKIN, JOHN EMORY

CLARY, BRIAN S.

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

STEELE, KYLE C.

RICE, B. STEVE

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

LABOON, JOHN ANDREW

JONES, D. ALLAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • PARTIAL REMOVAL TO BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - RICE, B. STEVE Person Filing - TEXACO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ANSWER FOURTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - PFIZER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ANSWER FOURTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ANSWER FOURTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • FOURTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - PROCTOR, FAIRY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2008
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLARY, BRIAN S. Person Filing - ENGINEERS AND FABRICATORS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JONES, D. ALLAN Person Filing - TIN INC (FKA TEMPLE-INLAND FOREST PRODUCTS CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2007
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - JONES, D. ALLAN Person Filing - TIN INC (FKA TEMPLE-INLAND FOREST PRODUCTS CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LEVINE, TORI SMITH Person Filing - AMF INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - PROCTOR, PAUL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - PROCTOR, FAIRY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - PROCTOR, FAIRY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - CLOUD, IAN PATRICK Person Filing - PROCTOR, PAUL D

    Read MoreRead Less