This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:24:50 (UTC).

PRICE, PRESSELL vs. A O SMITH CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 PRICE, PRESSELL filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A O SMITH CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8653

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

PRICE, PRESSELL

AMERAFLEX RUBBER & GASKET COMPANY INC

ANCO INSULATION INC

ASARCO INCORPORATED

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

D & F DISTRIBUTING INC

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

PARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY

GREENE TWEED & COMPANY INC

A O SMITH CORPORATION

A W CHESTERTON CO

ABLE SUPPLY COMPANY

AMCHEM PRODUCTS INC (FKA RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS)

RHONE-POULENC BASIC CHEMICALS

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC (FNA AMERICAN BILTRITE RUBBER COMPANY INC)

AMERICAN BILTRITE RUBBER COMPANY INC

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

72 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR.

CLARY, BRIAN S.

RAMSEY, RUSSELL J.

LACKEY, DOUG

BLAKENEY, MICHAEL LADON

GALLAGHER, KEVIN P

GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

FERGUSON, RICHARD YOUNG

KEITH, VICTORIA LEIGH OTT

CALDERON, RAUL M.

CARLSON, ERIC

JACKSON, JESSICA S.

WILKINSON, MELODY M.

POWELL, LISA A.

POWERS, JAMES H.

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

Other Attorneys

WHITE, CLAY M.

OGDEN, TODD DUANE

24 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANGE, SIDNEY TODD Person Filing - HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - GALLAGHER, KEVIN PATRICK Person Filing - GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILLINGHAM, R. MARK Person Filing - ASTENJOHNSON INC (AKA ASTEN GROUP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARMON, FRANCIS G. III Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HARMON, FRANCIS G. III Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HENNESSY, EDWARD J. Person Filing - WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - THOMPSON, JAMES MICHAEL Person Filing - PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - HARMON, FRANCIS G. III Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLEVINS, BRYAN O. JR. Person Filing - PRICE, PRESSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less