This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:39:58 (UTC).

PREUSS, MILTON vs. S-G OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 PREUSS, MILTON filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against S-G OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7374

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PREUSS, MILTON

PREUSS, ANA

Defendant

S-G OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMPKINS, JEFFREY JAMES

Defendant Attorney

HEARN, CLAYTON ROWLAND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2004
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2004
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HEARN, CLAYTON ROWLAND Person Filing - S-G OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TOMPKINS, JEFFREY JAMES Person Filing - PREUSS, ANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - TOMPKINS, JEFFREY JAMES Person Filing - PREUSS, MILTON

    Read MoreRead Less