This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/02/2021 at 07:56:49 (UTC).

PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY L P vs. NOBLE ENERGY INC

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY L P filed an Other lawsuit against NOBLE ENERGY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8822

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY L P

Defendant

NOBLE ENERGY INC

Other

NOBLE ENERGY INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANCY, CHRISTOPHER BLAIR

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

08/13/2021: Return of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

08/09/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Exhibit A

08/09/2021: Exhibit A

Request for issuance of Service

08/09/2021: Request for issuance of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NOBLE ENERGY INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 8/10/2021; Served: 8/11/2021; Tracking: 73900041; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DANCY, CHRISTOPHER BLAIR; Person Filing: PRECISION DRILLING COMPANY L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Precision Drilling Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NOBLE ENERGY INC is a litigant