This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/28/2019 at 16:39:17 (UTC).

POST AND LINTEL CONTRACTING LLC (DBA POST AND LINTEL REMODELING) vs. PEARL DELTA FUNDING LLC

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 POST AND LINTEL CONTRACTING LLC DBA POST AND LINTEL REMODELING filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PEARL DELTA FUNDING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are DAN HINDE and CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1638

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

DAN HINDE

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POST AND LINTEL REMODELING

POST AND LINTEL CONTRACTING LLC (DBA POST AND LINTEL REMODELING)

13334 Fiath Vall

Cypress, TX 77429

HOWARD, JOHN

LINGERFELT, DEWEY WAYNE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PEARL DELTA FUNDING LLC

100 Williams Street 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC

LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC (INCORRECTLY NAMED LOWE'S COMPANIES INC)

Others

LOWE'S COMPANIES INC (FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION)

PEARL DELTA FUNDING LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

PEAR DELTA FUNDING LLC (FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

100 Williams Street 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANE, ROBERT C.

6200 Savoy Driv

Houston, TX 77036

LANE, ROBERT CHAMLESS

6200 Savoy Driv

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REDDY, KRISHNA KANTH PANNALA

1901 Nw Militar

San Antoni, TX 78213

 

Court Documents

ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

07/18/2018: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

Exhibit 02

07/27/2018: Exhibit 02

Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Contempt

07/27/2018: Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Contempt

Exhibit 02

08/01/2018: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 3

09/07/2018: Exhibit 3

Plaintiffs Motion For No-Answer Default Judgment Against Pearl Delta Funding LLC

09/07/2018: Plaintiffs Motion For No-Answer Default Judgment Against Pearl Delta Funding LLC

ORDER SIGNED DENYING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/09/2018: ORDER SIGNED DENYING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Exhibit 9

10/10/2018: Exhibit 9

Exhibit 5

10/10/2018: Exhibit 5

Exhibit 3

10/10/2018: Exhibit 3

Exhibit 2

10/10/2018: Exhibit 2

Civil Process Request

11/05/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Request

11/20/2018: Civil Process Request

Proposed Temporary Restraining Order And Order Setting Hearing For Temporary Injunction

06/21/2018: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order And Order Setting Hearing For Temporary Injunction

Certified mail tracking number 7017 2400 0001 0791 2151

06/27/2018: Certified mail tracking number 7017 2400 0001 0791 2151

Pliantiffs' Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

07/05/2018: Pliantiffs' Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

Proposed Order Continuing Temporary Injunction Hearing

07/13/2018: Proposed Order Continuing Temporary Injunction Hearing

Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Continue the Temporary Injunction Hearing

07/12/2018: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Continue the Temporary Injunction Hearing

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • Description: INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 12/4/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Description: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: REDDY, KRISHNA KANTH PANNALA; Person Filing: LOWE'S COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Description: CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: REDDY, KRISHNA KANTH PANNALA; Person Filing: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS LLC (INCORRECTLY NAMED LOWE'S COMPANIES INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED DENYING DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Order Signed: 10/9/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Description: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/5/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Description: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 10/5/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Description: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/18/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: REDDY, KRISHNA KANTH PANNALA; Person Filing: LOWE'S COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/6/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 6/22/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 6/22/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 6/22/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANE, ROBERT CHAMLESS; Person Filing: HOWARD, JOHN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANE, ROBERT CHAMLESS; Person Filing: POST AND LINTEL REMODELING;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANE, ROBERT CHAMLESS; Person Filing: POST AND LINTEL CONTRACTING LLC (DBA POST AND LINTEL REMODELING);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LANE, ROBERT CHAMLESS; Person Filing: LINGERFELT, DEWEY WAYNE;

    Read MoreRead Less