Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 11:34:41 (UTC).

POPE, LAMONDA vs. JOSEPH, SABU (INDIVIDUALLY AND D B A GRACE DISTRIB

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 POPE, LAMONDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSEPH, SABU INDIVIDUALLY AND D B A GRACE DISTRIB. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9432

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POPE, LAMONDA

Defendants

JOSEPH, SABU (INDIVIDUALLY AND D B A GRACE DISTRIBUTORS)

City, TX 77459

GRACE DISTRIBUTORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YNIGEZ, JARED

Po Box 7418

Houston, TX 77248

Defendant Attorney

KABELE, CHARLES GEORGE

811 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Affidavit in Support of Service

04/28/2020: Affidavit in Support of Service

Citation (Sabu Joseph)

04/28/2020: Citation (Sabu Joseph)

DEFENDANT SABU JOSEPHS ORIGINAL ANSWER

05/15/2020: DEFENDANT SABU JOSEPHS ORIGINAL ANSWER

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

05/29/2020: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

03/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Plaintiff's Request for Admissions to Defendant Sabu Joseph, Individually, and D.B.A. Grace Distributors

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Request for Admissions to Defendant Sabu Joseph, Individually, and D.B.A. Grace Distributors

Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant Sabu Joseph Individually, and D.B.A. Grace Distributors

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant Sabu Joseph Individually, and D.B.A. Grace Distributors

Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant Sabu Joseph, Individually, and D.B.A. Grace Distributors

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant Sabu Joseph, Individually, and D.B.A. Grace Distributors

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery Requests

03/26/2020: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Discovery Requests

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingCourt: 151; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 5/29/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KABELE, CHARLES GEORGE; Person Filing: JOSEPH, SABU (INDIVIDUALLY AND D B A GRACE DISTRIBUTORS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KABELE, CHARLES GEORGE; Person Filing: GRACE DISTRIBUTORS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: JOSEPH, SABU (INDIVIDUALLY AND D B A GRACE DISTRIBUTORS); Issued: 4/2/2020; Served: 4/24/2020; Tracking: 73738551; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: YNIGEZ, JARED; Person Filing: POPE, LAMONDA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YNIGEZ, JARED