This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:15:14 (UTC).

POINDEXTER, ELTON EZRA vs. UNION CARBIDE CORP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 POINDEXTER, ELTON EZRA filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0656

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

POINDEXTER, ELTON EZRA

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORP

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

3M COMPANY (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DB RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

DB RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

WS BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION (FKA BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY)

BELLOWS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CHAMPLAIN CABLE COMPANY (FKA HERCULES INC)

HERCULES INC

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DIXON, DAVID ALLEN

STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

WADE, TODD N.

RHODES, KENNETH D.

BLAZEK, PAULA H

BOOK, WILLIAM C. JR.

POWERS, JAMES H.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

HAMILTON, PAUL EDWARD

Other Attorneys

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

ADAMS, KENT M.

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

MOIR, PETER A.

SHEEHY, RICHARD A.

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - DANA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - AMERICAN OPTICAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC (FKA GARLOCK INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - CALDERON, RAUL M. Person Filing - CHAMPLAIN CABLE COMPANY (FKA HERCULES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - STUART, KIMBERLY ROSE Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BLAZEK, PAULA H Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DIXON, DAVID ALLEN Person Filing - POINDEXTER, ELTON EZRA

    Read MoreRead Less