This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 07:38:21 (UTC).

PLD USLV RAMPART IC LP (BY AND THROUGH ITS GENERAL vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 PLD USLV RAMPART IC LP BY AND THROUGH ITS GENERAL filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is URSULA A. HALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8168

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

URSULA A. HALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PLD USLV RAMPART IC LP (BY AND THROUGH ITS GENERAL PARTNER PLD USLV

PROLOGIS L P (BY AND THROUGH ITS GENERAL PARTNER PROLOGIS INC)

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX, RAY L. JR.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

08/05/2021: PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION

EXHIBIT A

08/05/2021: EXHIBIT A

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

08/05/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

Citation

08/13/2021: Citation

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 8/6/2021; Served: 8/12/2021; Returned: 8/12/2021; Tracking: 73898896; Deliver To: CONST 1 ALAN ROSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COX, RAY L. JR.; Person Filing: PROLOGIS L P (BY AND THROUGH ITS GENERAL PARTNER PROLOGIS INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: COX, RAY L. JR.; Person Filing: PLD USLV RAMPART IC LP (BY AND THROUGH ITS GENERAL PARTNER PLD USLV;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROLOGIS, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COX, RAY L. JR.